TX HJR143 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the legislature to vest the power to invest and manage certain public funds in certain officers, boards, and entities.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the legislature to vest the power to invest and manage certain public funds in certain officers, boards, and entities.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - Adopted as amended RV#550 (Y: 128 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#550 |
2019-04-23 | House | Adopted as amended |
2019-04-23 | House | Amended 1-G. Bonnen |
2019-04-23 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB4452 (Enabled by) 2019-04-11 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control