TX HJR148 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for appointments to fill vacancies for certain judicial offices and for nonpartisan retention elections for those offices.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for appointments to fill vacancies for certain judicial offices and for nonpartisan retention elections for those offices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-11 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB4504 (Enabled by) 2019-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Appellate
Courts--District
Courts--Judges
CRIMINAL APPEALS, COURT OF
Elections
Elections--Judicial
Legislature
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
SUPREME COURT
Courts--Appellate
Courts--District
Courts--Judges
CRIMINAL APPEALS, COURT OF
Elections
Elections--Judicial
Legislature
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
SUPREME COURT
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HJR148 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HJ00148I.htm |