TX HJR28 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the legislature to set a lower limit on the maximum appraised value of a residence homestead for ad valorem taxation.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the legislature to set a lower limit on the maximum appraised value of a residence homestead for ad valorem taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB383 (Enabled by) 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
HJR51 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Ways & Means
HJR51 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Ways & Means
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HJR28 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HJ00028I.htm |