TX HJR34 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-12)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to provide for a temporary exemption from ad valorem taxation of a portion of the appraised value of certain property damaged by a disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to provide for a temporary exemption from ad valorem taxation of a portion of the appraised value of certain property damaged by a disaster.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1991 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Adopted RV#504 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Filed with the Secretary of State
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1991
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26SenateRecord vote
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-24HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-24HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-24SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-24SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2019-05-23SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-23HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-23HouseHouse requests conference committee
2019-05-23HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2019-05-20HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-20HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-20HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenatePassed
2019-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateReferred to Property Tax
2019-05-01SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-17HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17HouseRecord vote RV#504
2019-04-17HouseAdopted
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-17HousePlaced on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-12HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2019-02-12HouseRead first time
2018-12-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HB492 (Enabled by) 2019-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
SJR49 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback