TX HJR63 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment increasing the amount of time a person must have been a practicing lawyer or judge to be eligible to serve as a district court judge.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment increasing the amount of time a person must have been a practicing lawyer or judge to be eligible to serve as a district court judge.
Sponsors
Rep. Leo Pacheco [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SJR25 (Similar To) 2019-02-20 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Courts
Courts--District
Courts--General
Courts--Judges
Lawyers
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Courts--District
Courts--General
Courts--Judges
Lawyers
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HJR63 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HJ00063I.htm |