TX HJR64 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to repeal the constitutional provision providing that marriage in this state consists only of the union of one man and one woman and prohibiting this state or a political subdivision of this state from creating or recognizing any legal status identical or similar to marriage.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to repeal the constitutional provision providing that marriage in this state consists only of the union of one man and one woman and prohibiting this state or a political subdivision of this state from creating or recognizing any legal status identical or similar to marriage.
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Beckley [D] | Rep. Diego Bernal [D] | Rep. Celia Israel [D] | Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D] |
Rep. John Bucy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SJR9 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
Family
Family--Marriage Relationship
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
SAME-SEX MARRIAGE
Family--Marriage Relationship
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
SAME-SEX MARRIAGE
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HJR64 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HJ00064I.htm |