TX HJR72 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 20 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment permitting a person to hold more than one office as a municipal judge at the same time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment permitting a person to hold more than one office as a municipal judge at the same time.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Adopted RV#422 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22 Filed with the Secretary of State
2019-05-21SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-21HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-20HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenatePassed
2019-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-01SenateRead first time
2019-04-17SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#422
2019-04-16HouseAdopted
2019-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-16HousePlaced on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
2019-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HB1717 (Enabled by) 2019-06-10 - See remarks for effective date

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback