TX HR10 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Reported favorably as substituted
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Reported favorably as substituted
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Condemning China's practice of involuntary organ harvesting.
Title
Condemning China's practice of involuntary organ harvesting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-22 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2020-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HR10 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HR00010I.htm |