TX HR1082 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Carole Greisdorf on receiving the 2019 Distinguished Leadership Award from Leadership Plano.
Title
Congratulating Carole Greisdorf on receiving the 2019 Distinguished Leadership Award from Leadership Plano.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-12 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-12 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Filed |