TX HR112 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Honoring the life of Althea Lewis Renfro of Houston.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honoring the life of Althea Lewis Renfro of Houston.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-21HouseReported enrolled
2013-02-18HouseAdopted
2013-02-18HouseLaid before the House
2013-02-14HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2013-02-12HouseConsidered in Rules and Resolutions
2013-02-05HouseReferred to Rules & Resolutions
2013-01-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback