TX HR112 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

In memory of Pat Beard of Waco.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In memory of Pat Beard of Waco.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-25HouseReported enrolled
2015-02-19HouseAdopted
2015-02-19HouseLaid before the House
2015-02-19HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2015-02-16HouseConsidered in Rules and Resolutions
2015-02-12HouseReferred to Rules & Resolutions
2015-01-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback