TX HR1177 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Paying tribute to the memory of Alexander Neal Johnson of Chester and commemorating the renaming of the baseball field at Chester High School in his honor.
Title
Paying tribute to the memory of Alexander Neal Johnson of Chester and commemorating the renaming of the baseball field at Chester High School in his honor.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-18 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-18 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Filed |