TX HR1283 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Joyce Kathleen Giddens Matthews of Victoria.
Title
In memory of Joyce Kathleen Giddens Matthews of Victoria.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-03 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-03 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Filed |