TX HR1285 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Abby Caldwell of Humble for her service as an intern in the district office of State Representative Dan Huberty.
Title
Commending Abby Caldwell of Humble for her service as an intern in the district office of State Representative Dan Huberty.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Huberty [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-03 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-03 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Filed |