TX HR1287 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Bascom William Bentley IV.
Title
In memory of Bascom William Bentley IV.
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Harris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-01 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Filed |