TX HR1413 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 100th anniversary of the American Legion and the work of American Legion Post No. 472 in Houston.
Title
Commemorating the 100th anniversary of the American Legion and the work of American Legion Post No. 472 in Houston.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-10 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-10 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-08 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-26 | House | Filed |