TX HR1439 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting the speaker to provide for an interim house study on retirement security in Texas.
Title
Requesting the speaker to provide for an interim house study on retirement security in Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-10 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-04-29 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Interim Studies
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HR1439 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HR01439I.htm |