TX HR1540 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing May 14, 2019, as Alpha Kappa Alpha Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing May 14, 2019, as Alpha Kappa Alpha Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-14 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-05-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ALPHA KAPPA ALPHA DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates