TX HR1547 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing May 15, 2019, as the People's Champ Day, commending Paul Wall of Houston for his many achievements.
Title
Recognizing May 15, 2019, as the People's Champ Day, commending Paul Wall of Houston for his many achievements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-05-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
PEOPLE'S CHAMP DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
WALL, PAUL
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
WALL, PAUL