TX HR1613 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing May 14, 2019, as Salad Day at the State Capitol and commending the owners/operators of Texas McDonald's restaurants for their contributions to the state's economy.
Title
Recognizing May 14, 2019, as Salad Day at the State Capitol and commending the owners/operators of Texas McDonald's restaurants for their contributions to the state's economy.
Sponsors
Rep. Hubert Vo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-14 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-05-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
MCDONALD'S RESTAURANTS, TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
SALAD DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
SALAD DAY