TX HR2027 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Serena Nguyen on graduating as valedictorian of the Class of 2019 at Western Hills High School in Benbrook.
Title
Congratulating Serena Nguyen on graduating as valedictorian of the Class of 2019 at Western Hills High School in Benbrook.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-27 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-22 | House | Filed |