TX HR2096 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Arianna Douglas on graduating as salutatorian of the Class of 2019 at Veterans Memorial Early College High School in Brownsville.
Title
Congratulating Arianna Douglas on graduating as salutatorian of the Class of 2019 at Veterans Memorial Early College High School in Brownsville.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-27 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HR2116 (Same As) 2019-05-28 - Reported enrolled