TX HR2165 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing June 28-July 3, 2019, as General Conference of Grand Courts Heroines of Jericho of the United States and Bahamas Days in Irving.
Title
Recognizing June 28-July 3, 2019, as General Conference of Grand Courts Heroines of Jericho of the United States and Bahamas Days in Irving.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Meza [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-27 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
GENERAL CONFERENCE OF GRAND COURTS HEROINES OF JERICHO OF THE UNITED STATES & BAHAMAS DAYS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates