TX HR358 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Congratulating Mike A. Myers on his receipt of the Santa Rita Award from The University of Texas System Board of Regents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congratulating Mike A. Myers on his receipt of the Santa Rita Award from The University of Texas System Board of Regents.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseReported enrolled
2019-03-13HouseAdopted
2019-03-13HouseLaid before the House
2019-03-13HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2019-03-12HouseConsidered in Resolutions Calendars
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback