TX HR387 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing support for full reinstatement of Project Re-Integration of Offenders.
Title
Expressing support for full reinstatement of Project Re-Integration of Offenders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2019-03-12 | House | Correction in referral |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HR387 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HR00387I.htm |