TX HR510 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 25, 2019, as Texas Southern University Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing February 25, 2019, as Texas Southern University Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-27 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
TEXAS SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY DAY
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
TEXAS SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY DAY