TX HR928 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing support for Bags of Love, a Lufkin-based nonprofit organization, and its mission to make transitions easier for children in the care of the Texas Department of Family and Protective Services.
Title
Expressing support for Bags of Love, a Lufkin-based nonprofit organization, and its mission to make transitions easier for children in the care of the Texas Department of Family and Protective Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Trent Ashby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-05 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-05 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed |