TX HR990 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing May 2019 as Asian American and Pacific Islander Heritage Month.
Title
Recognizing May 2019 as Asian American and Pacific Islander Heritage Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Hubert Vo [D] | Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
Rep. Rick Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-01 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ASIAN AMERICAN & PACIFIC ISLANDER HERITAGE MONTH
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates