TX SB1 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Meeting cancelled
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Meeting cancelled
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
General Appropriations Bill.
Title
General Appropriations Bill.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00001I.htm |