TX SB1006 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of income-producing tangible personal property having a value of less than a certain amount.
Title
Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of income-producing tangible personal property having a value of less than a certain amount.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Kelly Hancock [R] | Sen. Angela Paxton [R] |
Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Rep. Charlie Geren [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4353 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Referred to Ways & Means
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Property Interests--Personal Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions