TX SB1007 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prepayment of ad valorem taxes.
Title
Relating to the prepayment of ad valorem taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Kelly Hancock [R] | Sen. Angela Paxton [R] |
Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-24 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |