TX SB1012 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of certain electric energy storage equipment requirements to municipally owned utilities and electric cooperatives.
Title
Relating to the applicability of certain electric energy storage equipment requirements to municipally owned utilities and electric cooperatives.
Sponsors
Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] | Rep. Justin Holland [R] | Rep. Dade Phelan [R] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] |
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] | Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-20 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-06 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#962 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 4449 |
2019-04-26 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-18 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-04-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-05 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4449 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call