TX SB1033 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to information regarding perinatal palliative care and prohibiting discriminatory abortions; creating an administrative penalty, a civil remedy, and a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to information regarding perinatal palliative care and prohibiting discriminatory abortions; creating an administrative penalty, a civil remedy, and a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-07 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2434 (Same As) 2019-04-18 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Abortion
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
PREBORN NONDISCRIMINATION ACT
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
PREBORN NONDISCRIMINATION ACT
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH