TX SB1037 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to limitations on the information reported by consumer reporting agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to limitations on the information reported by consumer reporting agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1361 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31 Effective immediately
2019-05-31 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-17HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-16SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-15SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-15SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1361
2019-05-14HousePassed
2019-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-07HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-30HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-30HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-23HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-10HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-04-10HouseRead first time
2019-04-09HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-08SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-08SenateRecord vote
2019-04-08SenatePassed
2019-04-08SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-08SenateRecord vote
2019-04-08SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-08SenateRecord vote
2019-04-08SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-08SenateRecord vote
2019-04-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-08SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-27SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-21SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-22SenateFiled
2019-02-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback