TX SB1107 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the right of conscientious refusal of a health care service.
Title
Relating to the right of conscientious refusal of a health care service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2892 (Same As) 2019-03-12 - Referred to Public Health
Subjects
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
MEDICAL CARE FACILITIES
PHYSICIANS
Religion
TEXAS HEALTH CARE RIGHT OF CONSCIENCE ACT
Health Care Providers
Health--General
MEDICAL CARE FACILITIES
PHYSICIANS
Religion
TEXAS HEALTH CARE RIGHT OF CONSCIENCE ACT
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1107 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01107I.htm |