TX SB1118 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to programs operated by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs to increase access to safe and affordable housing in this state.
Title
Relating to programs operated by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs to increase access to safe and affordable housing in this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--Finance
Housing--General
Housing--Rural
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--Finance
Housing--General
Housing--Rural