TX SB1130 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a task force on father engagement in this state.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a task force on father engagement in this state.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] | Sen. Beverly Powell [D] |
Rep. Harold Dutton [D] | Rep. James Frank [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-05-07 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Parent & Child
Governor
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
TASK FORCE ON FATHER ENGAGEMENT
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Parent & Child
Governor
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
TASK FORCE ON FATHER ENGAGEMENT