TX SB1138 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to securities contracts entered into by the Texas Treasury Safekeeping Trust Company.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to securities contracts entered into by the Texas Treasury Safekeeping Trust Company.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective immediately
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-25HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-25SenateRecord vote
2019-05-25SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-25SenateRead
2019-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1608
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-15HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-10HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-08HousePosting rule suspended
2019-05-06HouseReferred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
2019-05-06HouseRead first time
2019-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-26SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-26SenateRecord vote
2019-04-26SenatePassed
2019-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenateRecord vote
2019-04-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-16SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-16SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Finance
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-26SenateFiled
2019-02-26SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback