TX SB1140 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an independent medical review of certain determinations by the Health and Human Services Commission or a Medicaid managed care organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an independent medical review of certain determinations by the Health and Human Services Commission or a Medicaid managed care organization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-23HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-04-23HouseRead first time
2019-04-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenatePassed
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateAmended
2019-04-17SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Watson
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-17SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-11SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-26SenateFiled
2019-02-26SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3478 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback