TX SB1143 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the appraisal for ad valorem tax purposes of tangible personal property held for sale at retail and a franchise tax credit based on the ad valorem taxes paid on such property.
Title
Relating to the appraisal for ad valorem tax purposes of tangible personal property held for sale at retail and a franchise tax credit based on the ad valorem taxes paid on such property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3868 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Ways & Means
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Taxation
Taxation--Franchise
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Business & Commerce--General
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Taxation
Taxation--Franchise
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1143 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01143I.htm |