TX SB1146 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of certain local officials to serve as the chief appraiser of an appraisal district or as the assessor for a taxing unit that operates an appraisal office.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of certain local officials to serve as the chief appraiser of an appraisal district or as the assessor for a taxing unit that operates an appraisal office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1146 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01146I.htm |