TX SB1154 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of the Texas Civil Commitment Office and to certain requirements regarding the payment of costs associated with civil commitment by persons civilly committed as sexually violent predators.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of the Texas Civil Commitment Office and to certain requirements regarding the payment of costs associated with civil commitment by persons civilly committed as sexually violent predators.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Perry [R] | Rep. Ken King [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2019-04-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
SEXUAL OFFENDERS
TEXAS CIVIL COMMITMENT OFFICE
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
SEXUAL OFFENDERS
TEXAS CIVIL COMMITMENT OFFICE