TX SB1182 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to review and approval by the attorney general of certain bonds financing an educational facility for certain charter schools.
Title
Relating to review and approval by the attorney general of certain bonds financing an educational facility for certain charter schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-05-09 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-07 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4258 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
BONDS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
PUBLIC NOTICE
BONDS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
PUBLIC NOTICE