TX SB1192 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Texas college work-study program and to establishing a program for the off-campus employment of certain students at public or private institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the Texas college work-study program and to establishing a program for the off-campus employment of certain students at public or private institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-14 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-05-07 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Private Schools
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
INTERNET
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Private Schools
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
INTERNET
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control