TX SB1196 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to automatic employee participation in and administration of a deferred compensation plan provided by certain hospital districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to automatic employee participation in and administration of a deferred compensation plan provided by certain hospital districts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-11SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-11SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-27SenateFiled
2019-02-27SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2477 (Same As) 2019-05-25 - Reported enrolled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback