TX SB1205 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an appropriation of money from the general revenue fund to the State Soil and Water Conservation Board for the purpose of eradicating Carrizo cane, contingent on the receipt of federal funds for the same purpose.
Title
Relating to an appropriation of money from the general revenue fund to the State Soil and Water Conservation Board for the purpose of eradicating Carrizo cane, contingent on the receipt of federal funds for the same purpose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Agriculture
SOIL & WATER CONSERVATION BOARD, TEXAS STATE
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
WATER
Water--General
SOIL & WATER CONSERVATION BOARD, TEXAS STATE
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
WATER
Water--General