TX SB1207 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the operation and administration of Medicaid, including the Medicaid managed care program and the medically dependent children (MDCP) waiver program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the operation and administration of Medicaid, including the Medicaid managed care program and the medically dependent children (MDCP) waiver program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2021 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Amended RV#1511 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1506 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1508 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1507 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#2021
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts resolution to go outside bounds HR 2189
2019-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26SenateRecord vote
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts resolution to go outside bounds SR 846
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-23SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-23HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-23HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-23HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-23SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-23SenateSenate requests conference committee
2019-05-23SenateSenate refuses to concur
2019-05-23SenateRead
2019-05-23SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-20SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1511
2019-05-20HousePassed as amended
2019-05-20HouseAmended 1-Krause
2019-05-20HouseVote reconsidered
2019-05-17HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1508
2019-05-17HousePassed
2019-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1507
2019-05-17HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1506
2019-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-17HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HouseAmended 1-Krause and Parker
2019-05-17HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-05-17HousePostponed 5/17/19 10:15 PM
2019-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-07HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-07HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-01HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-05-01HouseCorrection in referral
2019-04-23HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-04-23HouseRead first time
2019-04-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenatePassed
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-17SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-11SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-27SenateFiled
2019-02-27SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3748 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1207
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01207I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01207S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01207E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01207H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01207F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-17-F.PDF#page=21
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1207&RcdVtNo=1507&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1207&RcdVtNo=1508&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1207&RcdVtNo=1506&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1207&RcdVtNo=1511&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1207&RcdVtNo=2021&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=25

Bill Comments

feedback