TX SB1248 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a community supervision and corrections department policy regarding supervision officer meetings and visits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a community supervision and corrections department policy regarding supervision officer meetings and visits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-04-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-02SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-04-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-27SenateFiled
2019-02-27SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB374 (Same As) 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback