TX SB125 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the term of a parking permit issued to a residential tenant by a landlord.
Title
Relating to the term of a parking permit issued to a residential tenant by a landlord.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1002 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Effective on 1/1/20
Subjects
PARKING
PERMITS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
PERMITS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB125 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00125I.htm |