TX SB1251 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the board of directors of the Greater East End Management District.
Title
Relating to the board of directors of the Greater East End Management District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-20 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Passed | |
2011-05-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-20 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-20 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-20 | Amended | |
2011-05-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-02 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-29 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-29 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-28 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-28 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-14 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-14 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-14 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-14 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-04 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-07 | Filed | |
2011-03-07 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
GREATER EAST END MANAGEMENT DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous